EP1266005 - REGULATION OF HUMAN LIPOXIN A4 RECEPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2007/10] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Shyam 76 Euston Road, Apartment 10 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | [2002/51] | Application number, filing date | 01925421.8 | 12.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001EP02729 | Priority number, date | US20000189037P | 14.03.2000 Original published format: US 189037 P | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0168839 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1266005 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266005 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/72, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C12Q1/68 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
G01N33/88 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C12Q1/68, C07K14/72, A61K38/17, G01N33/566 | ||
Former IPC [2002/51] | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, A61K38/17, A61P9/00, A61P37/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGULATION DES MENSCHLICHES LIPOXIN A4 REZEPTOR-ÄHNLICHES PROTEIN | [2002/51] | English: | REGULATION OF HUMAN LIPOXIN A4 RECEPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN | [2002/51] | French: | REGULATION DE LA PROTEINE DE TYPE DU RECEPTEUR DE LA LIPOXINE A4 HUMAINE | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | IE | 12.03.2007 | LU | 12.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
LU | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0022131 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 9, 10 *; | [PX]WO0026339 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [PX] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 1-4;; claims 1-14 *; | [PX]WO0031258 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 9, 10 *; | [PX]DE19930512 (BRUES MICHAEL [DE], et al) [PX] 1-16 * the whole document;; claims 1-16 *; | [E]EP1094075 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 1 & 2;; claims 1,9-14,28-35 *; | [E]WO0136473 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [E] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 67, 68, 91-94;; claims 1-42 *; | [E]WO0142288 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-16 * SEQ ID NO: 23 & 62;; claims 1-16 *; | [X] - EMBL, (19981023), URL: EBI, XP002183865 [X] 1-3 * Nucleotides: 111.300 to 113.600; Homo sapiens chromosome 11 * | [X] - J F MADDOX ET AL., "Lipoxin A4 Stable Analogs are potent Mimetics that stimulate human monocytes and THP-1 cells via a G-protein-coupled Lipoxin A4 Receptor", J BIOL CHEM, (19970314), vol. 272, no. 11, pages 6972 - 6978, XP002183863 [X] 14,15 * results, pages 6973-6974;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.49.30993 |