EP1285893 - VEHICLE-USE LOW-REFLECTION GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMIOKA, Takao C-303, 271-8, Fujikubo, Miyosi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama 354-0041 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01925922.5 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001JP03586 | Priority number, date | JP20000135398 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000135398 | [2003/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185636 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285893 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/34, B60J1/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
G02B1/115 (EP,US);
B60J3/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C03C17/3435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | GLASS MIT NIEDRIGER REFLEXION ZUR VERWENDUNG IN FAHRZEUGEN | [2003/09] | English: | VEHICLE-USE LOW-REFLECTION GLASS | [2003/09] | French: | VERRE A FAIBLE REFLEXION POUR VEHICULE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2002 | Translation filed | 07.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 15.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03275533 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]US5496621 (MAKITA KENSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0822107 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]JP2000290044 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [XP]EP1052525 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS6470701 | JPH04357134 | JPH04357135 | JPH09156964 | JPH1149532 | JPH11271507 |