Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9245838 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | B2 | US2015130079 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | US27416208 | 19.11.2008 | US201514601541 | 21.01.2015 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | US10737708 | 22.04.2008 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8822323 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2010140803 | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | US10736408 | 22.04.2008 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | US69862210 | 02.02.2010 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8293579 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2009263939 | 22.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | US10737708 | 22.04.2008 | US49634209 | 01.07.2009 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8959756 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2009077796 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | US27416208 | 19.11.2008 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | US10737708 | 22.04.2008 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7999387 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2011 | B2 | US2008230914 | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | US10736408 | 22.04.2008 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8524535 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2013 | B2 | US2008206926 | 28.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | US10737708 | 22.04.2008 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7852634 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B2 | US2008169123 | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | US3419308 | 20.02.2008 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8067699 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2011 | B2 | US2008151522 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | US74797207 | 14.05.2007 | US3406908 | 20.02.2008 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7908745 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2008148563 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | US74797207 | 14.05.2007 | US3403708 | 20.02.2008 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7893360 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2007209831 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | US38063103 | 21.03.2003 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | US74797207 | 14.05.2007 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7855342 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | B2 | US2004014317 | 22.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20030060898 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101093471B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2011 | B1 | KR20100054882 | 25.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4785268B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2011 | B2 | JP2002246761 | 30.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001123875 | 23.04.2001 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4270769B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2009 | B2 | JP2002246757 | 30.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001104050 | 03.04.2001 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4869488B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | B2 | JP2002246756 | 30.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001084434 | 23.03.2001 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4618919B | Global Dossier | 26.01.2011 | B2 | JP2002246504 | 30.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2001094722 | 29.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4931283B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B2 | JP2002170840 | 14.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061115 | 06.03.2001 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4475836B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2010 | B2 | JP2002170827 | 14.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061116 | 06.03.2001 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1321980 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2007 | A4 | EP1321980 | 25.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0103589 | 25.04.2001 | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW546999B | 11.08.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0227786 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100797422B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2008 | B1 | KR20070087691 | 28.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100539106C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN1901182 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1278413C | 04.10.2006 | C | CN1466777 | 07.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1901177B | 12.05.2010 | B | CN1901177 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1901181B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN1901181 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000382807 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382813 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290232 | 25.09.2000 | JP2000382806 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000382814 | 15.12.2000 | JP2000290231 | 25.09.2000 |