EP1321980 - SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, MULTI-LAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MULTI-LAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAMOTO, Hajime, Ogaki-kita-kojou, Ibiden Co., Ltd 1, Kitakata 1-chome, Ibigawacho Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
WANG, Dongdong, Ogaki-kita-kojou, Ibiden Co., Ltd 1, Kitakata 1-chome, Ibigawacho Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01925925.8 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001JP03589 | Priority number, date | JP20000290231 | 25.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000290231 | JP20000290232 | 25.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000290232 | JP20000382806 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382806 | JP20000382807 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382807 | JP20000382813 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382813 | JP20000382814 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382814 | [2003/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0227786 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321980 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/12, H01L21/60, H05K3/46 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L23/525 (KR);
H01L23/49838 (US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/49822 (US);
H01L23/49866 (US);
H01L23/49894 (EP,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L24/19 (EP,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H05K1/185 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/12105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/20 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/274 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73267 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92244 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01018 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15174 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15312 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3511 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09563 (EP,US);
H05K2201/096 (EP,US);
H05K3/4602 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49124 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49133 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49139 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49144 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/24227, H01L2924/1517 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/03 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/82 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517, H01L2924/15153 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15787, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HALBLEITERELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES HALBLEITERELEMENTS, MEHRSCHICHTIGE LEITERPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN LEITERPLATTE | [2003/26] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, MULTI-LAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MULTI-LAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2003/26] | French: | ELEMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, CARTE A CIRCUIT IMPRIME MULTICOUCHE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE A CIRCUIT IMPRIME MULTICOUCHE | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2003 | Translation filed | 11.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3775844 (PARKS H) [A] 27-40 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0471938 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5111278 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W [US]) [X] 1,24 * the whole document *; | [X]US5455459 (FILLION RAYMOND A [US], et al) [X] 6-13,16-23 *see Figure 1 and accompanying description*; | [A]US5521122 (KURAMOCHI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 35,36 * the whole document *; | [X]US5629564 (NYE III HENRY A [US], et al) [X] 16-23 * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 10; figure 3 *; | [XY]EP0777274 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,24,25 * column 5, line 47 - column 10, line 57; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 4,5,26,41-43; | [Y]JPH1098081 (HITACHI CABLE) [Y] 41-43* abstract *; | [XA]US5841193 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES WILLIAM [US]) [X] 14,15 * column 10, lines 64,65 * [A] 35; | [A]US6025995 (MARCINKIEWICZ WALTER M [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1003209 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 14,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022] - [0033]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1024531 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [Y] 4,5,26 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1032030 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 14-17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0031] * | International search | [A]JPH03101234 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH0465832 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JPH10284632 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JP2000260902 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) |