EP1295881 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MALARIA AND METHOD OF TREATING MALARIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAIDAN HOJIN BISEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYU KAI 14-23, Kami Ohsaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0021 / JP | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [2008/41] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states ZAIDAN HOJIN BISEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYU KAI 14-23, Kami Ohsaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0021 / JP | ||
For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Tomio, New Fuji Mansion 701 1-11, Higashi Gotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | 02 /
WATAYA, Yusuke 2-58, Kadotayashiki 2-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama 703-8275 / JP | 03 /
IINUMA, Munekazu 3-7, Usa 4-chome Gifu-shi, Gifu 500-8368 / JP | 04 /
KIM, Hye-Sook Coop Asashi 202, 2-17, Tsushima Honcho Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0089 / JP | 05 /
WATABE, Hiroomi 760, Morookacho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0002 / JP | 06 /
NAGANAWA, Hiroshi 3-17, Denenchofu Honcho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 145-0072 / JP | 07 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshikazu 366-26, Aiharacho Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0211 / JP | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01925951.4 | 26.04.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001JP03619 | Priority number, date | JP20000126369 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126369 | [2003/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0181339 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1295881 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295881 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D407/14, A61K31/351, A61P33/06 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C07D407/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61P33/06 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEMISCHE ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON MALARIA UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MALARIA | [2003/13] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MALARIA AND METHOD OF TREATING MALARIA | [2003/13] | French: | COMPOSES POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PREVENTION DU PALUDISME ET PROCEDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU PALUDISME | [2003/13] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2002 | Translation filed | 22.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | BE | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IT | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | IE | 26.04.2009 | LU | 26.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.04.2009 | ||
LU | 26.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 19.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS63192792 ; | [A]EP0011859 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]US4221724 (LIU CHAO-MIN, et al); | [A]US4269971 (YAMAGISHI MICHIO, et al); | [A]US4283493 (LIU CHAO-MIN, et al); | [DA]US4876273 (HAMILL ROBERT L [US], et al) | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881209), vol. 012, no. 472, Database accession no. (C - 551), & JP63192792 A 19880810 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD) [DA] * abstract * | International search | [A]EP0305086 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) |