EP1291803 - METHOD FOR ATTACHING AUTHENTICATION BAR CODE, AUTHENTICATION METHOD, APPARATUS FOR ATTACHING AUTHENTICATION BAR CODE, AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND PORTABLE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeness Corporation 1-11-13, Jousai Nishi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-0053 / JP | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAMOTO, Yoshihisa 260-4, Okitayama-Haradaniinui-cho Kita-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603-8511 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMURA, Mitsuo, JENESS CORPORATION 1-11-13, Jousai Nishi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-0053 / JP | 03 /
YANAGI, Yukio, JENESS CORPORATION 1-11-13, Jousai Nishi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-0053 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01925990.2 | 26.04.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001JP03661 | Priority number, date | JP20000133741 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000133741 | [2003/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0184473 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291803 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, G06K7/00, H04M11/00, H04L9/32, H04M3/42 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/21 (EP,US);
G07C9/33 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G06K7/00, H04M11/00, H04L9/32, H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANHAENGEN EINES AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSBARCODES, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANHAENGEN VON AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSBARCODES, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND TRAGBARES ENDGERAET | [2003/18] | English: | METHOD FOR ATTACHING AUTHENTICATION BAR CODE, AUTHENTICATION METHOD, APPARATUS FOR ATTACHING AUTHENTICATION BAR CODE, AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND PORTABLE TERMINAL | [2003/11] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS D'AUTHENTIFICATION, D'ATTRIBUTION DE CODE BARRES D'AUTHENTIFICATION, ET TERMINAL PORTABLE | [2003/11] |
Former [2003/11] | VERFAHREN ZUM ANHDNGEN EINES AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSBARCODES, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANHDNGEN VON AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSBARCODE, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND TRAGBARES ENDGERDT | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2002 | Translation filed | 09.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0003328 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * the whole document * * figures 7,11,13 *; | [X]US5855007 (JOVICIC NEBOISA [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 5, line 21 - column 8, line 47 * * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 21 * * figures 1-3; example 6 *; | [X]WO9930256 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 15 - page 9, line 2 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X] - PENDHARKAR V ET AL, "A microprocessor-based entry access and identification logging system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTEENTH SOUTHEASTERN SYMPOSIUM ON SYSTEM THEORY IEEE NEW YORK, NY, USA, (1982), pages 154 - 157, XP009057733 [X] 19 * Introduction, p.154 * | [A] - PETERS S, "THE CHANGES IN AUTOMATIC IDENTIFICATION", MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, STERLING PUBLICATIONS LTD. LONDON, GB, (199201), ISSN 0950-4451, page 141,145, XP000241819 [A] 1-21 * Introductory passage, p.141 * | [A] - MOORE B, "Data collection: employee ID badges", P & IM REVIEW AND APICS NEWS USA, (198707), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 0274-9874, pages 33 - 34, XP001207810 [A] 1-21 * Time and attendance, p.33 * * Access Control, p.34 * | [A] - "RegiSoft Demonstrates Mobile e-Commerce Solutions at Cebit 2000", PRESS RELEASE, (20000225), XP002178891 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - ANON, "RegiSoft Demonstrates Mobile Commerce Solutions at the GSM World Congress 2000", PRESS RELEASE, FR, (20000131), URL: http://www.regisoft.com/news/press/GSM_world.html, (20051128), XP002356376 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - "Mobile Ticketing - the test-bed for mobile transactions", MOBILE INTERNET ANALYST, (20000410), pages 5 - 8, URL: http://banners.noticiasdot.com/termometro/boletines/docs/telcos/varios/2000/Mobile_Ticketing.pdf, (20051128), XP002356377 [A] 1-21 * The POS infrastructure problem, p.6-7 * | [A] - "MOBILKOM AUSTRIA - NEUES FÜR TELEFONBENÜTZER", TELELETTER - TELEKOMMUNIKATION IN ÖSTERREICH, AT, (199908), page 1,2,6-7, URL: http://www.bmvit.gv.at/sixcms_upload/media/119/teleletter99_3.pdf, (20051128), XP002356378 [A] 1-21 * ÖBB-Tickets übers Handy: Einfache Bedienung via SMS, Zahlung mit der Handyrechnung, p.7 * | [A] - "Ericsson and VISA announce strategic partnership to promote mobile e-commerce", PRESS RELEASE, (19991117), URL: http://www.wapforum.org/new/111799_ericsson.htm, (20051128), XP002356379 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [XE]JP2001005883 (NTT DATA CORP); | [A]JPH09502038 |