EP1276580 - MILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2016/42] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property HB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSON, Lars-Ola Råsundavägen 12 B 811 61 Sandviken / SE | 02 /
PANTZAR, Göran Sörbyvägen 41 810 22 Arsunda / SE | 03 /
SVENNINGSSON, Inge Norra Hasselgatan 15 811 35 Sandviken / SE | [2016/42] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
HANSSON, Lars-Ola rsundavägen 12 B S-811 61 Sandviken / SE | ||
02 /
PANTZAR, Göran Sörbyvägen 41 S-810 22 Arsunda / SE | |||
03 /
SVENNINGSSON, Inge Norra Hasselgatan 15 S-811 35 Sandviken / SE | |||
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
HANSSON, Lars-Ola rsundavägen 12 B S-811 61 Sandviken / SE | ||
02 /
PANTZAR, Göran Sörbyvägen 41 S-810 22 rsunda / SE | |||
03 /
SVENNINGSSON, Inge Norra Hasselgatan 15 S-811 35 Sandviken / SE | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/15] | Köppen, Manfred, et al WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01926281.5 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001SE00885 | Priority number, date | SE20000001554 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: SE 0001554 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0183142 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276580 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276580 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1276580 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/20 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B23C5/006 (EP,US);
B23C5/20 (KR);
B23C5/109 (EP,US);
Y10T407/191 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FRÄSER | [2003/04] | English: | MILLING TOOL | [2003/04] | French: | FRAISE | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 18.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 02
11.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner mbB, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
02
11.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner mbB, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Stellbrink, Axel, et al, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
11.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner mbB, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 DE-80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Stellbrink, Axel, et al, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
11.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Sties, Jochen, et al, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
02
11.09.2008
KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Sties, Jochen, et al, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2008
11.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd P.O. Box 11 IL-Tefen 24959 / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 17.10.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.04.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.04.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.09.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T0580/12 | 08.05.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 19.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CH | 12.12.2007 | CY | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | LI | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | IE | 25.04.2008 | LU | 25.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
TR | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
LU | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
LU | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0555192 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [A] 1-6; | [A]US5368418 (BENTJENS BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-6; | [PA]EP1002608 (ISCAR LTD [IL]) [PA] 1-6; | [PA]EP1077100 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP])[PA] 1-6 | Opposition | US4417489 | US4808044 | US5913644 | WO9936217 |