EP1268433 - CYCLIC LACTAMS AS INHIBITORS OF A-BETA-PROTEIN PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company P.O. Box 4000 Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company PO Box 4000 Princeton, New Jersey 08443-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Richard, E. 7 Pelham Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 02 /
YANG, Michael, G. 15 South Hampshire Court Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01926560.2 | 03.04.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US10667 | Priority number, date | US20000194503P | 03.04.2000 Original published format: US 194503 P | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174783 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268433 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/18, C07D243/24, C07D401/12, C07D223/12, C07D403/12, C07D223/16, C07D243/14, C07D401/06, A61K31/55, A61K31/551, A61K31/5513, A61P25/28, C07K5/06, C07K5/08, A61K38/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C07D223/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D223/10 (EP,US);
C07D223/12 (EP,US);
C07D223/18 (EP,US);
C07D243/14 (EP,US);
C07D243/24 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHE LACTAME ALS A-BETA-PROTEINPRODUKTIONSINHIBITOREN | [2003/01] | English: | CYCLIC LACTAMS AS INHIBITORS OF A-BETA-PROTEIN PRODUCTION | [2003/01] | French: | LACTAMES CYCLIQUES UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA PRODUCTION DE LA PROTEINE BETA-AMYLOIDE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4897489 (YOSHIOKA KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * examples 46A,46B *; | [XA]WO9216524 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * example 19, step A * * page 62, line 14; example 29 * [A] 1,21; | [X]US5378844 (BRUFANI MARIO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 48 - line 49 *; | [X]WO9828268 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,21 * examples 7C-36,7C-224,7C-230,7C-236,7C-242 * * claim 2 *; | [X]WO9966934 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,21 * page 25; claim 41 *; | [A]WO9967221 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1,21* claim 1 * |