EP1274401 - STABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING 7-SUBSTITUTED-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTANOIC ACIDS OR 7-SUBSTITUTED-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTENOIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Michael 62 Mahal Street Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
DOROSSIEV, Ivo 39 Yehuda Halevi Street Herzlia / IL | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2014/33] |
Former [2003/03] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01926775.6 | 09.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US11514 | Priority number, date | US20000195916P | 10.04.2000 Original published format: US 195916 P | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176566 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274401 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274401 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1274401 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/26, A61K9/14, A61K9/48 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | STABILE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND 7-SUBSTITUIERTE-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTANSÄUREN ODER 7-SUBSTITUIERTE-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTENSÄUREN | [2003/03] | English: | STABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING 7-SUBSTITUTED-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTANOIC ACIDS OR 7-SUBSTITUTED-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTENOIC ACIDS | [2003/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES STABLES CONTENANT DES ACIDES 7-SUBSTITUES-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTANOIQUES OU ACIDES 7-SUBSTITUES-3,5-DIHYDROXYHEPTENOIQUES | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 09.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2008 | Observations by third parties | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP11168818.0 Application withdrawn : 24.06.2011 | EP11171296.4 / EP2382970 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponents representative Elend, Almut Susanne, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponents representative Elend, Almut Susanne, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | 23.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.01.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.07.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5350584 (MCCLELLAND GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,15-22,40,41 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 2, lines 65-67 * * column 5, lines 14-16,37-51 * * column 7, lines 1-3 * * example 2 * * claims 1-4 *; | [XD]US5686104 (MILLS NANCY [US], et al) [XD] 1,6-8,15,16,21,27,29,40,41 * claim 14 ** column 2, lines 12-64 *; | [X]WO9857917 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8-12,15-18,40,41 * page 5, lines 8,18 - page 7, line 25 * * example 1 * | International search | [Y]US5180589 (JOSHI YATINDRA M [US], et al); | [Y]US5582838 (RORK GERALD S [US], et al); | [Y]US6147090 (DENINNO MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [Y]US6207664 (HAYWARD CHERYL M [US], et al); | [Y]US6245797 (WINOKUR MELVIN [US]) | Examination | US4739073 | other | US4739073 | WO9857917 | Opposition | US4739073 | US5078997 | US5098893 | WO0072825 | US6316460 | - Guidance for Industries Q1A(R2) Stability Testing of New Drug Substances and Products, USA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, (200311), vol. 2, pages 1 - 22 |