EP1275001 - DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT FLOW PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEXX LABORATORIES, INC. One Idexx Drive Westbrook, ME 04092 / US | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Scott, M. 6 Brentwood Road Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 / US | 02 /
SUVA, Robert, H. 215 Pope Road Windham, ME 04062 / US | 03 /
KEPRON, Michael, R. 26 Ridge View Drive Standish, ME 04084 / US | 04 /
BARSKI, Stanislaw, Jr. 428 Stone Hill Road Limerick, ME 04048 / US | 05 /
WORKMAN, Erwin, F., Jr. P O Box 19146 Greensboro, NC 27419 / US | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/03] | 01 /
CLARK, Scott, M. 6 Brentwood Road Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 / US | ||
02 /
SUVA, Robert, H. 215 Pope Road Windham, ME 04062 / US | |||
03 /
KEPRON, Michael, R. 26 Ridge View Drive Standish, ME 04084 / US | |||
04 /
BARSKI, Stanislaw, Jr. 428 Stone Hill Road Limerick, ME 04048 / US | |||
05 /
WORKMAN, Erwin, F., Jr. 3 Hunts Point Road Cape Elizabeth, ME 04170 / US | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01926844.0 | 11.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US11773 | Priority number, date | US20000551496 | 18.04.2000 Original published format: US 551496 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0184153 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1275001 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/558 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/12 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTIZIERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER VIELZAHL UNABHÄNGIGER STROMWEGE | [2003/03] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT FLOW PATHS | [2003/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET METHODE DE DIAGNOSTICS INTEGRES A CIRCUITS D'ECOULEMENT INDEPENDANTS MULTIPLES | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5185127 (VONK GLENN P [US]); | [A]GB2261283 (BUNCE ROGER A [GB], et al); | [DA]US5750333 (CLARK SCOTT M [US]); | [A]WO9852044 (CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC CHEMICALS [GB], et al) |