EP1274724 - MACROCYCLIC NS3-SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS COMPRISING ALKYL AND ARYL ALANINE P2 MOIETIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033-0530 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATRAMAN, Srikanth 35 Roanoke Street Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Kevin, X. 44 Gill Lane, Apt. 1D Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | 03 /
ARASAPPAN, Ashok 18 Larsen Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
NJOROGE, F., George 11 Softwood Way Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 05 /
GIRIJAVALLABHAN, Viyyoor, M. 10 Maplewood Drive Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 06 /
CHAN, Tin-Yau 26 Barlow Road Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 07 /
MCKITTRICK, Brian, A. Millbrook Road New Vernon, NJ 07976 / US | 08 /
PRONGAY, Andrew, J. 104 Willow Grove Road Stewartsville, NJ 08886 / US | 09 /
MADISON, Vincent, S. 12 Ronarm Drive Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/03] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01927142.8 | 17.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US12530 | Priority number, date | US20000198204P | 19.04.2000 Original published format: US 198204 P | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0181325 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1274724 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K14/18, C07K5/062, C07K5/065, C07K5/107, A61K38/05, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, A61P31/14 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
C07K5/0202 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 28.10.2002 | SI | 28.10.2002 | Title | German: | MAKROZYKLISCHEN NS3-SERIN-PROTEASE-INHIBITOREN DES HEPATITIS C VIRUS MIT ALKYL- UND ARYL-ALANIN-GRUPPEN IN P2 STELLUNG | [2003/03] | English: | MACROCYCLIC NS3-SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS COMPRISING ALKYL AND ARYL ALANINE P2 MOIETIES | [2003/03] | French: | INHIBITEURS MACROCYCLIQUES DE LA PROTEASE NS3-SERINE DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C COMPRENANT DES FRACTIONS P2 ALKYLE ET ARYLE ALANINE | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9907734 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-28* example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9964442 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-28 * example 2C; claim - *; | [DA]WO0009558 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [DA] 1-28 * example -; claim - *; | [DX] - MARCHETTI A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF TWO NOVEL CYCLIC BIPHENYL ETHER ANALOGS OF AN INHIBITOR OF HCV NS3 PROTEASE", SYNLETT, THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (199906), no. S01, ISSN 0936-5214, pages 1000 - 1002, XP008002749 [DX] 1-28 * the whole document * |