EP1282571 - SPLIT DRIVE COMPONENT WITH MAINTAINED ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies, Inc. 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago, IL 60601 / US | [2004/47] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEON, Michael, A. 1135 Edgewood Ranch Road Orlando, FL 32835 / US | [2003/07] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01927145.1 | 17.04.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001US12538 | Priority number, date | US20000572271 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: US 572271 | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187745 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282571 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282571 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/10, B65G39/02, B65G39/04, F16C13/00 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
B65G39/04 (EP,US);
B65G13/10 (EP,US);
B65G39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/18] |
Former [2003/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETEILTER ANTRIEBSBAUTEIL MIT FESTER AUSRICHTUNG | [2003/07] | English: | SPLIT DRIVE COMPONENT WITH MAINTAINED ALIGNMENT | [2003/07] | French: | ELEMENT D'ENTRAINEMENT EN DEUX PARTIES PERMETTANT DE MAINTENIR L'ALIGNEMENT | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5378203 (BAEBEL RONALD G [US]) [X] 1,4,19 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 41; figure - * [A] 6,11; | [XA]US4993540 (VAN CAPELLEVEEN PIETER [NL]) [X] 1,4,19 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 3; figure - * [A] 6,11; | [A]US5404984 (HAGMAN ERLAND L [US]) [A] 1,2,6,11,19 * column W * | by applicant | US4981209 | US5064045 |