EP1276626 - DISTANCE-RELATED METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/10] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUEDER, Jens Im Obstgarten 20 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
UHLER, Werner Augsteinerstrasse 11 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 03 /
WINNER, Hermann Theodor-Roessler-Str. 18 76467 Bietigheim / DE | [2008/10] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
LUEDER, Jens Im Obstgarten 20 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | ||
02 /
UHLER, Werner Augsteinerstrasse 11 76646 Bruchsal / DE | |||
03 /
WINNER, Hermann Im Mehl 3 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 01927602.1 | 24.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001DE01150 | Priority number, date | DE20001018558 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018558 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179013 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276626 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276626 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1276626 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, // B60K31/00 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60K31/0066 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2552/30 (EP);
B60W2554/00 (EP,US);
B60W2554/805 (US);
|
Former IPC [2003/04] | B60K31/00, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ABSTANDSBEZOGENES VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2003/04] | English: | DISTANCE-RELATED METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF A VEHICLE | [2003/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA VITESSE D'UN VEHICULE EN FONCTION DE LA DISTANCE | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE ADC Automotive Distance Control System GmbH Kemptenerstr. 99 88131 Lindau (Bodensee) / DE Opponent's representative Bobbert, Christiana Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE ADC Automotive Distance Control System GmbH Kemptenerstr. 99 88131 Lindau (Bodensee) / DE Opponent's representative Bobbert, Christina Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstraße 19 D-90411 Nürnberg / DE | 13.01.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.01.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.04.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0657857 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure 7; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US5467283 (BUTSUEN TETSURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-4,9,10 *; | [A]US5745870 (YAMAMOTO YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 13 - line 31; claims 8,15,26,31 *; | [DA]DE19722947 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1060937 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PA] 1-10* claim - * | Examination | EP0775919 | WO0033151 | by applicant | DE4242700 | EP0775919 | DE19722947 |