EP1257491 - HAND-HELD DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION OF A TOTAL TAPE ONTO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Opposition rejected | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92110 Clichy / FR | [2003/48] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states BIC Deutschland GmbH & Co. Rossertstrasse 6 65835 Liederbach / DE | ||
For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92611 Clichy Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouveresse, Jean-Antide c/o Société Bic 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières F-92611 Clichy Cedex / FR | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01927664.1 | 12.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP01534 | Priority number, date | EP20000103993 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: EP 00103993 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0162644 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257491 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257491 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00, B65H37/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B65H35/0033 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1343 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1348 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1365 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1795 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGERÄT ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES GESAMTEN STREIFENS AUF EIN SUBSTRAT | [2002/47] | English: | HAND-HELD DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION OF A TOTAL TAPE ONTO A SUBSTRATE | [2002/47] | French: | APPAREIL PORTATIF DESTINE A L'APPLICATION D'UNE BANDE ENTIERE DANS UN SUBSTRAT | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2005
13.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, et al, et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2005
13.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, et al, et al Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | 10.08.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/15] | 26.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5076883 (BOSLEY STEPHEN C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,14,17-19 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 13; figure - * [Y] 3,5-13,15,16,20; | [YA]JPH10330021 ; | [YA]DE3109735 (IIYAMA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7,15,16 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-5; | [YA]US2755953 (VOGT CLARENCE W) [Y] 8,9 * figures 1,7,8 * [A] 1-5,10-13; | [YA]EP0297060 (VIFAN SPA [IT]) [Y] 20 * figure 2 * [A] 1,17-19; | [X]US5707482 (FUSSELMAN STEPHEN M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,14-19 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, line 14 - line 34; figure - *; | [X]DE2150239 (AVERY PRODUCTS CORP) [X] 1,8,11-19 * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US3369951 (FRITZINGER GEORGE H) [A] 1-8,11-13 * figures 1,2 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10330021 A 19981215 (FURUKAWA TERUO) [Y] 3,5,10-13 * abstract * [A] 1,2,4,8,14,17-19 |