EP1257530 - AMINOSULFONYLBIPHENYL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORSCH, Dieter Königsberger Strasse 17A 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 02 /
JURASZYK, Horst Kleiner Ring 14 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
MEDERSKI, Werner Katzenelnbogenweg 1 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 04 /
TSAKLAKIDIS, Christos Im Langgewann 54 69469 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
BERNOTAT-DANIELOWSKI, Sabine Liebigstrasse 5 61231 Bad-Nauheim / DE | 06 /
MELZER, Guido Mörikestrasse 6 65719 Hofheim/Taunus / DE | 07 /
GLEITZ, Johannes Liebigstrasse 26 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 08 /
BARNES, Christopher Alleestrasse 21 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 09 /
VICKERS, James 4 Haldane Road Caversham Reading Berks RG4 7PS / GB | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/14] |
Former [2002/47] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01927690.6 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP02034 | Priority number, date | DE20001008329 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10008329 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0162717 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257530 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/46, C07C311/29, A61K31/18, A61P9/10, A61P29/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07C311/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 10.07.2002 | LV | 10.07.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 10.07.2002 | SI | 10.07.2002 | Title | German: | AMINOSULFONYLBIPHENYLDERIVATE | [2002/47] | English: | AMINOSULFONYLBIPHENYL DERIVATIVES | [2002/47] | French: | DERIVES D'AMINOSULFONYLBIPHENYLE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9828282 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [A] 1,4-7,9 * page 3 - page 4; claims 1,21 *; | WO9941231 [ ] (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [ ] * Beispiele 7(68),19(68) *; | [PX]WO0071509 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1,4-7,9 * examples 48,67 *; | [PX]WO0071510 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,9 * examples 1,3,6-12,14,15,18,20-23,25 *; | [PX]WO0071511 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,9 * examples 1,2,19 *; | [PX]WO0071512 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,9* examples 3,6 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19991004), vol. 131, no. 14, Database accession no. 184864n, page 709, XP002172415 [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * abstract * |