EP1274398 - METHODS FOR THEPREPARATION OF EFFERVESCENT GRANULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYPHARM 194 Bureaux de la Colline Bâtiment D 92213 St Cloud Cedex / FR | ||
[N/P] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Joseph, R. 41 Chequamegon Bay Madison, WI 53719 / US | ||
02 /
McGINITY, James, William 4209 Dunning Lane Austin, TX 78746 / US | |||
03 /
DELMAS, Pascal 97 McCulloch Outremont, Quebec H2Y 3L8 / CA | |||
[2003/03] | |||
Representative(s) | Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 01927938.9 | 20.04.2001 | |
[2003/03] | |||
WO2001EP05017 | |||
Priority number, date | US20000553528 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: US 553528 | |
[2003/03] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | |
No.: | WO0180822 | ||
Date: | 01.11.2001 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2001/44] | |||
Type: | A2 Application without search report | ||
No.: | EP1274398 | ||
Date: | 15.01.2003 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2003/03] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP1274398 | ||
Date: | 08.10.2008 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2008/41] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 |
Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/16 | [2003/03] |
CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
| ||
Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | ||
Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | |
LT | Not yet paid | ||
LV | Not yet paid | ||
MK | Not yet paid | ||
RO | Not yet paid | ||
SI | 22.10.2002 | ||
Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BRAUSEGRANULATE | [2008/12] |
English: | METHODS FOR THEPREPARATION OF EFFERVESCENT GRANULES | [2008/12] | |
French: | TECHNIQUES DE PREPARATION DE GRANULES EFFERVESCENTS | [2008/12] | |
Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | |
11.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
11.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | |
14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | ||
19.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | ||
23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
08.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | ||
07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | ||
03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
[2011/43] | |||
Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0443381 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [DY] 1-5 * the whole document *; | |
[Y]WO9215197 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 29 - page 31; examples 1,2 *; | |||
[Y]GB2307857 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 7 - line 31 * * page 4; example 3 *; | |||
[X]DE19822036 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 36 - line 59 * * page 6; example 8 *; | |||
[T]US6071539 (ROBINSON JOSEPH R [US], et al) [T] 1-5* column W * |