EP1281161 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROPEAN COMMUNITY 1049 Brussels / BE | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAUSSE D'AGRAIVES, Bertrand Via Caprera, 10 I-21014 Laveno / IT | 02 /
CHIARAMELLO, Michel Via Brughera, 2 I-21014 Laveno M. / IT | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 01927944.7 | 07.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001EP05147 | Priority number, date | LU20000090580 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: LU 90580 | [2003/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0186589 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281161 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1281161 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/14, G01B9/02, G07D7/12 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
G06V20/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | 21.10.2002 | LT | 21.10.2002 | LV | 21.10.2002 | MK | 21.10.2002 | RO | 21.10.2002 | SI | 21.10.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN EINES GEGENSTANDES | [2003/06] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT | [2003/06] | French: | METHODE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN OBJET | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 08.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2004 | IE | 25.02.2004 | TR | 25.02.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | PT | 25.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 25.02.2004 | |
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
LU | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | IE | 25.02.2004 | |
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | IE | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | IE | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 25.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]GB2221870 (DE LA RUE CO PLC [GB]) [DX] 1,2,5,7-10 * abstract * * page 7, line 1 - line 7 * * page 7, line 13 - line 17 * * page 3, line 21 - line L * * page 4, line 16 - line 31 * * page 8, line 10 - line 19 * * page 10, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 3 - line 9 * * page 11, line 19 - line 27 * * figures 2,4 * [A] 3,4; | [A]DE4408226 (LEHMANN PETER DIPL PHYS [DE], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 44 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0768511 (EUROP ECONOMIC COMMUNITY [LU]) [A] 1* the whole document * |