21.01.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2005 |
First examination report |
|
27.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.12.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.06.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
18.04.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
18.04.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
12.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.04.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
29.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
19.12.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|