EP1315436 - CHILDREN'S CUTLERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ma'rku, Ildy 115, avenue du Bruse 83140 Six Fours les Plages / FR | For all designated states Espenel, Nicole 66, impasse Escudier 83210 Sollies-Toucas / FR | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Roman, Michel Cabinet Roman 35, rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Roman, Michel CABINET ROMAN 35 rue Paradis, BP 2224 13207 Marseille Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01927991.8 | 18.04.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001FR01187 | Priority number, date | FR20000004962 | 18.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0004962 | [2003/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178562 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315436 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47G21/02 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
A47G21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | KINDERBESTECK | [2003/23] | English: | CHILDREN'S CUTLERY | [2003/23] | French: | SERVICE DE COUVERTS DE TABLE POUR ENFANTS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.2003 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 06.02.2003 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.02.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   24.03.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2004 | 30.04.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2004 | 30.04.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5975909 (RITCHIE SAMUEL E) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 15; figure - *; | [Y]WO9610939 (PAPARONE GILDA) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5741915 ; | [A]US2889624 (MCDONALD) [A] 3,7 * column 2, line 12 - column 2, line 44; figure - *; | [A]WO8906152 (NIKKAL IND LTD) [A] 4,5 * page 5, line 3 - page 14, line 6; figure - *; | [A]JPH06125831 ; | [A]US4380122 (JAGGER PETER C); | [A]GB2308053 (LITTLE PEOPLE LTD); | [A]US983736 (MACONOCHIE) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820624), vol. 006, no. 113, Database accession no. (M - 138), & JP57041915 A 19820309 (MORI MAKOTO) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940808), vol. 018, no. 421, Database accession no. (C - 1234), & JP06125831 A 19940510 (WINGS:KK) [A] 5,7 * abstract * |