EP1274481 - DEVICE FOR LOCALLY APPLYING COLD DURING A TRAUMATIC TREATMENT OF THE SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benguigui, Jean-Jacques 15, chemin de Cantelaude 33610 Cestas / FR | For all designated states Bertrand, Bernadette 63, rue Surson 33000 Bordeaux / FR | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 01927993.4 | 18.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001FR01189 | Priority number, date | FR20000005054 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0005054 | FR20000010357 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010357 | [2003/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178828 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274481 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61F7/10 (EP);
A61F2007/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÖRTLICHEN ANBRINGEN VON KÄLTE WÄHREND EINER BEHANDLUNG DER VERLETZTEN HAUT | [2003/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCALLY APPLYING COLD DURING A TRAUMATIC TREATMENT OF THE SKIN | [2003/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION LOCALISEE DE FROID DURANT UN TRAITEMENT TRAUMATISANT DU DERME | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 23.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3207159 (KAZUMA TATEISI) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4508106 (ANGRES GIORA G) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9321974 (EREZ URI ;SINGER YUVAL (IL); SINGER FEDERICO (US)) [A] 1 * abstract * |