EP1294912 - GTP BINDING STRESS-RELATED PROTEIN AND METHODS OF ITS USE IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/13] | GTP BINDING STRESS-RELATED PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS | ||
[2006/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA COSTA e SILVA, Oswaldo 203 Littleford Lane Apex, NC 27502 / US | 02 /
BOHNERT, Hans, J. 2514 Pembrook Point Champaign, IL 61820 / US | 03 /
VAN THIELEN, Nocha 206-T Hyde Park Court Cary, NC 27513 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Ruoying 105 Rustic Pine Court Apex, NC 27502 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
DA COSTA e SILVA, Oswaldo 203 Littleford Lane Apex, NC 27502 / US | ||
02 /
BOHNERT, Hans, J. 2514 Pembrook Point Champaign, IL 61820 / US | |||
03 /
VAN THIELEN, Nocha 206-T Hyde Park Court Cary, NC 27513 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Ruoying 105 Rustic Pine Court Apex, NC27502 / US | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01928388.6 | 06.04.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US11291 | Priority number, date | US20000196001P | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 196001 P | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0177161 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294912 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1294912 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00, A01H5/10, C07K14/415, C12N5/10, C12N15/29 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/8273 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8217 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | 07.10.2002 | LT | 07.10.2002 | LV | 07.10.2002 | MK | 07.10.2002 | RO | 07.10.2002 | SI | 07.10.2002 | Title | German: | STRESS-GEKOPPELTES GTP-BINDENDE PROTEIN UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN PFLANZEN | [2006/40] | English: | GTP BINDING STRESS-RELATED PROTEIN AND METHODS OF ITS USE IN PLANTS | [2006/40] | French: | PROTÉINE DE FIXATION DE LA GTP LIÉ AU STRESS ET TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION DANS DES PLANTES | [2006/40] |
Former [2003/13] | STRESS-GEKOPPELTE GTP-BINDENDE PROTEINE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN PFLANZEN | ||
Former [2003/13] | GTP BINDING STRESS-RELATED PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS | ||
Former [2003/13] | PROT INE DE FIXATION DE LA GTP LI E AU STRESS ET TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION DANS DES PLANTES | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07000603.6 / EP1783229 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | IT | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | LU | 06.04.2007 | IE | 10.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LU | 06.04.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 21.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9800545 (INST OF ARABLE CROPS RESEARCH [GB], et al) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 15 - line 30 *; | [Y] - HUTTON JENNA L ET AL, "The Physcomitrella patens GPalpha1 homologue is located at protonemal cell junctions.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (199807), vol. 49, no. 324, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 1113 - 1118, XP001040374 [Y] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jexbot/49.324.1113 | [A] - SANO H ET AL, "Expression of the gene for a small GTP binding protein in transgenic tobacco elevates endogenous cytokinin levels, abnormally induces salicylic acid in response to wounding, and increases resistance to tobacco mosaic virus infection.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1994, (1994), vol. 91, no. 22, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10556 - 10560, XP002195725 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.22.10556 | [A] - MACHUKA JESSE ET AL, "Sequence analysis of expressed sequence tags from an ABA-treated cDNA library identifies stress response genes in the moss Physcomitrella patens.", PLANT AND CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (199904), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0781, pages 378 - 387, XP000946663 [A] 1-28 * page 378, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 380; table 1 * * page 386, column 2 * | [A] - RESKI R, "MOLECULAR GENETICS OF PHYSCOMITRELLA", PLANTA, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (199905), vol. 208, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 301 - 309, XP000881434 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004250050563 |