EP1282413 - HALOGENATED 2-AMINO-5,6 HEPTENOIC ACID DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation 100 Route 206 North Peapack, NJ 07977 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation Corporate Patent Department, P.O. Box 5110 Chicago, IL 60680 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAPPERHAUS, Margaret, L. 518 Nancy Court Troy, IL 62294 / US | 02 /
SIKORSKI, James, A. 3562 Piedmont Road ,Apt .117 Atlanta, GA 30305 / US | 03 /
AWASTHI, Alok, K. 9438 Keystone Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | 04 /
WANG, Lijuan, J. 919 Crown Point Estates Drive Wildwood, MO 63021 / US | 05 /
PITZELE, Barnett, S. 7924 North Tripp Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | 06 /
HANSEN, Donald, W., Jr. 7934 Karlov Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | 07 /
MANNING, Pamela, T. 3539 Highway T Labadie, MO 63055 / US | [2003/15] |
Former [2003/07] | 01 /
GRAPPERHAUS, Margaret, L. 518 Nancy Court Troy, IL 62294 / US | ||
02 /
SIKORSKI, James, A. 1400 West Adams Kirkwood, MO 63122 / US | |||
03 /
AWASTHI, Alok, K. 9438 Keystone Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | |||
04 /
WANG, Lijuan, J. 919 Crown Point Estates Drive Wildwood, MO 63021 / US | |||
05 /
PITZELE, Barnett, S. 7924 North Tripp Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | |||
06 /
HANSEN, Donald, W., Jr. 5250 West Brown Street Skokie, IL 60076 / US | |||
07 /
MANNING, Pamela, T. 3539 Highway T Labadie, MO 63055 / US | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01928544.4 | 13.04.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001US12258 | Priority number, date | US20000197032P | 13.04.2000 Original published format: US 197032 P | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178719 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282413 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/221, A61K31/195, A61K31/41, C07C259/14, C07C229/30, C07D271/06, C07D257/04 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
C07D271/07 (EP,US);
C07C259/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C257/14 (EP,US);
C07C259/06 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | 11.10.2002 | LT | 11.10.2002 | LV | 11.10.2002 | MK | 11.10.2002 | RO | 11.10.2002 | SI | 11.10.2002 | Title | German: | HALOGENIERTE 2-AMINO-3,4-HEPTENSÄURE DERIVATE ALS STICKSTOFFMONOXID-SYNTHASE-INHIBITOREN | [2003/07] | English: | HALOGENATED 2-AMINO-5,6 HEPTENOIC ACID DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS | [2003/07] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE HEPTENOIQUE 6, 2-AMINO-5 HALOGENES UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE SYNTHASE DU MONOXYDE D'AZOTE | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 23.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO9525717 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al); | [X]US5684008 (HALLINAN ANN E [US], et al); | [X]US5854251 (HALLINAN ANN E [US], et al); | [X]US5863931 (BEAMS RICHARD MANSFIELD [GB], et al); | [X]US5919787 (HALLINAN ANN E [US], et al); | [X]US5945408 (WEBBER R KEITH [US], et al); | [X]US5981511 (GAPUD ROLANDO E [US], et al); | [XP]US6169089 (HALLINAN ANN E [US], et al) | Examination | WO9946240 | WO0222562 | - LEE, YOUNGHEE ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 7, pages 1097 - 1104, XP002197243 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(99)00029-2 |