EP1303334 - GOLF BALL TEEING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tee Up Pty Ltd 291 Mount Dandenong Tourist Road Sassafras Victoria 3787 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Tee Up Pty Ltd 291 Mount Dandenong Tourist Road Sassafras, Victoria 3787 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKHARDT, Franz, Charles, Jr 291 Mount Dandenong Tourist Road Sassafras, Victoria 3787 / AU | 02 /
ECKHARDT, Franz, Sr 16-18 Observatory Road Mount Dandenong, Victoria 3767 / AU | 03 /
HEFFERNAN, Christopher, Patrick c/- 1 Shearson Crescent Mentone, Victoria 3194 / AU | 04 /
HOWE, James, Francis c/- 1 Shearson Crescent Mentone, Victoria 3194 / AU | 05 /
ROCHE, Lawrence, Adrian c/- 1 Shearson Crescent Mentone, Victoria 3194 / AU | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Badger, John Raymond J.R. Badger & Co. 6 Simpson Road Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Badger, John Raymond 6 Simpson Road, Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | ||
Former [2007/16] | Bridle, Andrew Barry, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road Leicester LE2 3FL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929119.4 | 11.05.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001AU00540 | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ09006 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: AU PQ900600 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0207827 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303334 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B47/00, A63B57/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A63B47/002 (EP,US);
A63B57/0006 (EP,US);
A63B2047/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GOLFBALLABLAGEVORRICHTUNG | [2003/17] | English: | GOLF BALL TEEING DEVICE | [2003/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN PLACE DE BALLES DE GOLF SUR UN TEE | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1598971 (KENYON EDWARD H) [A] 5,6 * page 1, line 23 - line 104; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2711321 (MCGRAW SR JOHN W) [A] 5,6* column 4, line 5 - line 65; figure - *; | [Y]US3448985 (SCOTT HOWARD A) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US5022657 (BUSSIERE JOSEPH P [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5,6; | [XA]US5322291 (SMITH RONALD T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 53; figures 1-6 * [A] 5 | International search | [X]JPH08141128 ; | [X]US3966213 (BRADLEY JOHN G); | [X]US4602789 (CHUNG BONG J [CA]); | [X]WO8901354 (E Z DRIVE INC [US]); | [X]GB2224216 (MOORE GILLIAN); | [X]GB2231803 (ENSCOE JOHN EDWARD); | [X]US5016886 (GOULD BOBBY J [US]); | [X]US5022657 (BUSSIERE JOSEPH P [CA], et al); | [X]US5282629 (ECKSTEIN RANDALL S [US]); | [X]US5326107 (PARK HYO C [US]); | [X]US5356148 (ELDER JR JOHN F [US]); | [X]FR2727321 (LASSERIE GERARD PHILIPPE [FR]); | [X]US5611737 (RAU TIMOTHY P [US], et al); | [X]US5916033 (DOHERTY WILLIAM L [US]); | [X]US5971862 (YATES PATRICK D [US]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 32, Database accession no. 1996-316737, XP008094498 & JPH08141128 A 19960604 (HASEGAWA) |