EP1259443 - COMMISSIONING DEVICE WITH VERTICAL PRODUCT STORAGE UNITS AND LOWER CONVEYOR BELT OR SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knapp Logistik Automation Gesellschaft MBH Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7 8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREUDELSPERGER, Karl Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7 A-8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08 81609 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08 81609 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01929364.6 | 26.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001EP02174 | Priority number, date | DE2000109560 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10009560 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0164557 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259443 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259443 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65G59/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B65G59/068 (EP,US);
B65G1/1376 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/45] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMISSIONIERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERTIKALEN PRODUKTSPEICHERN UND UNTEREM FÖRDERBAND ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2002/48] | English: | COMMISSIONING DEVICE WITH VERTICAL PRODUCT STORAGE UNITS AND LOWER CONVEYOR BELT OR SIMILAR | [2002/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PREPARATION DES COMMANDES A L'AIDE DE CONTENANTS DE STOCKAGE VERTICAUX ET BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE INFERIEURE OU EQUIVALENT | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61145047 ; | [X]US2780342 (GOOD PAUL F) [X] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 24 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0265749 (WOMAKO MASCH KONSTR [DE]) [A] 1-17* column 4, line 19 - line 43 *; | [A]DE9309881U (KNAPP LOGISTIK AUTOMATION [AT]) [A] 1-17 * claim 15 *; | [AD]EP0960836 (SI HANDLING SYSTEMS [US]); | [PX]DE20003757U (KNAPP LOGISTIK AUTOMATION [AT]) [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861121), vol. 010, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 537), & JP61145047 A 19860702 (MUNEHARU FUKUMOTO) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |