EP1280713 - ULTRAVIOLET LIGTH-BLOCKING BOTTLE LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/06] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBLIN, John Edward 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 02 /
BAE-LEE, Myongsuk 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 03 /
BORY, Barbara Helen 2375 Hudson Terrace, Apart. 3B 3B Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | 04 /
HSU, Feng-Lung Gordon 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 05 /
KUZMENKA, Daniel Joseph 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 06 /
MURPHY, Dennis Stephen 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 07 /
NEUSER, Kristina Marie 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Hardy, Susan Margaret, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hardy, Susan Margaret, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Hardy, Susan Margaret, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929625.0 | 07.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001EP05121 | Priority number, date | US20000568061 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: US 568061 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185568 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280713 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280713 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1280713 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1280713 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/30 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
B65D81/30 (EP,US);
B65D23/0842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETTSTRAHLENBLOCKIERENDE FLASCHENETIKETTEN | [2003/06] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET LIGTH-BLOCKING BOTTLE LABELS | [2003/06] | French: | ETIQUETTES POUR BOUTEILLES REDUISANT DES RAYONS UV | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/06] | TIQUETTES POUR BOUTEILLES TRANSPARENTES/TRANSLUCIDES | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
01.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
01.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 24.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.01.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.01.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.04.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 01.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0173/07 | 09.05.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.01.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | CY | 07.05.2005 | LU | 07.05.2005 | IE | 09.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
PT | 18.01.2005 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH0958687 ; | [XA]JPH06345879 ; | [A]US3402843 (CAMPBELL PAUL E) [A] * abstract *; | [A]GB1372102 (ANCHOR HOCKING CORP) [A] 1 * page 2, line 36 - line 52; claim - *; | [A]US3912100 (GRAHAM PAUL W L, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 10 - line 45; figure - *; | [A]US4734304 (TSUBONE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 4, line 3 - line 7 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09058687 A 19970304 (FUJI SEAL CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8,11-13,20 * abstract * [A] 7,9,10,14-18,21,22 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06345879 A 19941220 (OSAKA SHINKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-13,20 * abstract * [A] 3,7,9,10,14-18,21,22 | by applicant | US2612510 | US2784220 | GB1303810 | US3812042 | GB2228940 | EP0461537 | WO9726315 | US19410007776 | Opposition | US4053666 | EP0461537 | WO9219505 | US5205960 | JPH11105067 | WO0149575 |