EP1285375 - MANY-TO-MANY CORRESPONDANCE: METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR REPLACING INTERBANK FUNDS TRANSFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2005/52] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states ORACLE CORPORATION 500 Oracle Parkway, MS 5op7 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Richard, C. 7542 Shadwhill Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/09] | Spoor, Brian, et al Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01930738.8 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US13307 | Priority number, date | US20000199932P | 26.04.2000 Original published format: US 199932 P | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0182193 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285375 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/0855 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORRESPONDENZ VON VIELEN ZU VIELEN: VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM ERSETZEN VON GELDTRANSFERS ZWISCHEN BANKEN | [2003/09] | English: | MANY-TO-MANY CORRESPONDANCE: METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR REPLACING INTERBANK FUNDS TRANSFERS | [2003/09] | French: | CORRESPONDANCE MULTIVOQUE: PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE REMPLACEMENT DES VIREMENTS INTERBANCAIRES | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | Request for further processing for: | 13.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [XP]US6076074 ; | [X]US5848400 ; | [A]US5455407 |