EP1274978 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE HANDLING CHARACTERISTICS OF A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DB Reise & Touristik AG Stephensonstrasse 1 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Deutsche Bahn AG Potsdamer Platz 2 10782 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÄGLITZ, Mario Grillparzer Str. 5 12163 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SUNDER, Reinhold Schrader-Velgen-Weg 4 85778 Haimhausen / DE | 03 /
KOLBASSEFF, Alexander Tannenstrasse 15 83527 Haag-Rosenberg / DE | 04 /
KIENINGER, Kurt Jagdhornstr. 45 81827 München / DE | 05 /
ACKERMANN, Thomas Bergstr. 3 85368 Wang / DE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG HLM 4 - Patentabteilung Richelstrasse 3 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/03] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung TZ 02 Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01931622.3 | 19.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001EP04428 | Priority number, date | DE2000120520 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10020520 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0184105 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274978 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274978 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/08, B61L23/04 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B61L23/044 (EP);
B61L23/045 (EP);
B61L23/047 (EP);
G01M17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN VON FAHREIGENSCHAFTEN EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGES | [2003/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE HANDLING CHARACTERISTICS OF A RAIL VEHICLE | [2003/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SURVEILLER LES CARACTERISTIQUES DE ROULEMENT D'UN VEHICULE SUR RAILS | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 07.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.06.2004 | GB | 23.06.2004 | IE | 23.06.2004 | NL | 23.06.2004 | TR | 23.06.2004 | DK | 23.09.2004 | GR | 23.09.2004 | SE | 23.09.2004 | ES | 04.10.2004 | PT | 23.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GB | 23.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
TR | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GB | 23.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GB | 23.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 23.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8200805 (SINHA B) [A] 1,20 * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 11 *; | [A]EP0178468 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3515061 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,11-15 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 8 *; | [A]DE19502670 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 13-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19826115 (ZEHRFELDT ECKEHART [DE]) [A] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE19836081 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,16-22 * the whole document * [A] 6-15 |