EP1289706 - HOLLOW PRODUCT, FLUID PROCESSING SYSTEM AND JOINING METHOD OF HOLLOW MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAMOTO, Tatsuya c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZU, Seiji c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
WAKIDE, Kazushi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Böckelen, Rainer TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01932018.3 | 30.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001IB00943 | Priority number, date | JP20000165893 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000165893 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0192696 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289706 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289706 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
F01N13/1838 (EP,US);
F01N13/00 (KR);
B21D19/02 (EP,US);
B21D22/14 (EP,US);
B21D53/88 (EP,US);
B23K20/12 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
F01N13/18 (EP,US);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/18] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HOHLER GEGENSTAND, VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES FLUIDS UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN HOHLER GEGENSTÄNDE | [2003/11] | English: | HOLLOW PRODUCT, FLUID PROCESSING SYSTEM AND JOINING METHOD OF HOLLOW MEMBERS | [2003/11] | French: | PRODUIT CREUX, SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE FLUIDE ET PROCEDE DE JONCTION D'ELEMENTS CREUX | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 17.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB747829 (DALLOW LAMBERT & COMPANY LTD) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 59 - line 70; figures 3,6 *; | [X]US3396813 (HALL JAMES R) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 29 - line 30 * * column 3, line 41 - line 44 * * column 6, line 34 - line 51 *; | [X]US3779446 (LEMELSON J) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 33 - line 38 * * column 3, line 11 - line 27 * * column 5, line 2 - line 13 * * column 5, line 27 - line 34 * * column 7, line 44 - line 49; figure - *; | [X]US4132437 (GREEN TERRENCE A) [X] 1,4 * abstract *; | [X]FR2564536 (STUDER NORBERT [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 10; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0259010 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 7 - line 22; figure 2 *; | [X]US5154340 (PEACOCK HAROLD B [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]WO9961764 (SANGO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4; | [X]EP0972915 (SANGO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 19 - line 21 * * column 2, line 27 - line 29 * * column 5, line 33 - line 48 * * column 6, line 13 - line 42; figures 3,5; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO0016924 (SANGO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10; | [AP]EP1025923 (SANGO CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-10* the whole document *; | [PX]DE29905633U (KUKA SCHWEISSANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-10 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1085178 (SANGO CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,4 * column 9, line 54 - line 58 * * column 5, line 47 - line 55 * * column 4, line 30 - line 34; figure 1 * | by applicant | JPS63132790 | JPH09234877 | JPH09242540 | JPH1029077 | JP2957163B |