EP1302985 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BONDED WAFER AND BONDED WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Masatake, c/o Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 02 /
YOKOKAWA, Isao, c/o Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 03 /
MITANI, Kiyoshi, c/o Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01932319.5 | 29.05.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001JP04499 | Priority number, date | JP20000160499 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000160499 | [2003/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193334 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302985 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H01L21/76254 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (KR);
Y10S438/974 (EP,US);
Y10S438/977 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEBONDETEN WAFERS UND GEBONDETER WAFER | [2003/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BONDED WAFER AND BONDED WAFER | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUETTE COLLEE ET CETTE DERNIERE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2002 | Translation filed | 10.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 03.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0878647 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH1098005 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]US5909627 (EGLOFF RICHARD [US]); | [X]JPH11307747 (NEC CORP); | [A]EP0971396 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) |