EP1286992 - PIPERIDYINDOLES AS SEROTONIN RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fairhurst, John Eli Lilly and Company Limited Kingsclere Road Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 2XA / GB | 02 /
Gallagher, Peter Eli Lilly and Company Limited Kingsclere Road Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 2XA / GB | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2003/10] | Kingsbury, Oliver William Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01932534.9 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001US11744 | Priority number, date | GB20000012082 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0012082 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187881 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286992 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, A61K31/54, A61K31/475, A61K31/445, A61P25/00 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPERIDYLINDOLE ALS SEROTONINREZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2003/10] | English: | PIPERIDYINDOLES AS SEROTONIN RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2003/10] | French: | PIPERIDYINDOLES COMME LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR DE LA SEROTONINE | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19500689 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]FR2675801 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-9 *; | [Y]WO9958525 (LILLY CO ELI [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP0013612 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *; | [Y]FR2621588 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]EP0897921 (LILLY CO ELI [GB]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-12 *; | [PY]WO0049017 (LILLY CO ELI [GB], et al) [PY] 1-12 * claims 1-7 *; | [PY]WO0031074 (LILLY CO ELI [GB]) [PY] 1-12 * claims 1-10 *; | [PY]WO0078716 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [PY] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *; | [Y]EP0350403 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *; | [Y]EP0536419 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-11 * |