EP1280947 - MELTBLOWN WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDISILL, Edgar, N. 1123 Lipscomb Drive Nashville, TN 37204 / US | 02 /
BANSAL, Vishal 11912 Kingsbury Court Richmond, VA 23233 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Michael, C. 2300 Edgeview Lane Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Thomson, James Burgess Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Thomson, James B. Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01933283.2 | 10.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001US15138 | Priority number, date | US20000203686P | 11.05.2000 Original published format: US 203686 P | US20010852380 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: US 852380 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0186044 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1280947 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280947 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62, D01F8/14, D01F8/06, D01D5/098, D04H1/42, D04H1/56, D04H13/00, B32B5/26 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/435 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/0985 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/43828 (EP,US);
D04H1/43832 (EP,US);
D04H1/43838 (EP,US);
D04H1/55 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
D04H1/724 (KR);
D04H5/06 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2369 (EP,US);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US);
Y10T442/335 (EP,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
Y10T442/638 (EP,US);
Y10T442/641 (EP,US);
Y10T442/68 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZGEBLASENER VLIESSTOFF | [2003/06] | English: | MELTBLOWN WEB | [2003/06] | French: | TOILE REALISEE PAR FUSION-SOUFFLAGE | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.08.2008 | [2009/39] | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02104755 ; | [X]JPH11107154 ; | [PX]WO0109425 (DU PONT [US]) [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900704), vol. 014, no. 310, Database accession no. (C - 0736), & JP02104755 A 19900417 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-8,17-20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11107154 A 19990420 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-8,17-19 * abstract * |