EP1282415 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING BACTERIAL GROWTH AND PATHOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRINCETON UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Licensing & IP, New South Building, 4th floor, P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | For all designated states Quorex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2075-J Corte del Nogal Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | For all designated states University Technologies International, Inc. 3553 - 31st Street N.W., Suite 130 Calgary Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states PRINCETON UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Licensing & IP, New South Building, 4th floor, P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | ||
For all designated states Quorex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2075-J Corte del Nogal Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
For all designated states University Technologies International, Inc. 3553 - 31st Street N.W., Suite 130 Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | |||
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Princeton University Office of Technology Licensing and Intellectual Property, New South Building, 4th Floor, P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | ||
For all designated states Quorex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2075-J Corte del Nogal Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
For all designated states University Technologies International, Inc. 3553 - 31st Street N.W., Suite 130 Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSLER, Bonnie, L. 39 Pine Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | 02 /
DAMMEL, Carol, S. 28677 Faircrest Way Escondido, CA 92026 / US | 03 /
SCHAUDER, Stephan 13 Rue du Vingtain F-69110 Saine-Foy-les-Lyon / FR | 04 /
SHOKAT, Kevan 726A Liggett Avenue San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | 05 /
STEIN, Jeffrey 13525 Samantha Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 06 /
SURETTE, Michael, G. 58 Hawkwood Boulevard, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3G 2R9 / CA | [2003/20] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
BASSLER, Bonnie, L. 39 Pine Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | ||
02 /
DAMMEL, Carol, S. 28677 Faircrest Way Escondido, CA 92026 / US | |||
03 /
SCHAUDER, Stephan Apt. G-1, 120 Prospect Av. Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
SHOKAT, Kevan 726A Liggett Avenue San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | |||
05 /
STEIN, Jeffrey 13525 Samantha Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
06 /
SURETTE, Michael, G. 58 Hawkwood Boulevard, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3G 2R9 / CA | |||
Former [2003/07] | 01 /
BASSLER, Bonnie, L. 39 Pine Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | ||
02 /
DAMMEL, Carol, S. 28677 Faircrest Way Escondido, CA 92026 / US | |||
03 /
SCHAUDER, Stephan Apt. G-1, 120 Prospect Av. Pri nceton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
SHOKAT, Kevan 726A Liggett Avenue San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | |||
05 /
STEIN, Jeffrey 13525 Samantha Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
06 /
SURETTE, Michael, G. 58 Hawkwood Boulevard, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3G 2R9 / CA | Representative(s) | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Webber, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/07] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01933298.0 | 10.05.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001US15221 | Priority number, date | US20000203000P | 10.05.2000 Original published format: US 203000 P | US20000254398P | 07.12.2000 Original published format: US 254398 P | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185664 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282415 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/385 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG VON BAKTERIELLEN WACHSTUM UND PATHOGENESE | [2003/07] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING BACTERIAL GROWTH AND PATHOGENESIS | [2003/07] | French: | COMPOSES ET PROCEDES UTILISES POUR REGULER LA CROISSANCE BACTERIENNE ET LA PATHOGENIE | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5593827 (BYCROFT BARRIE W [GB], et al); | [X]US5759798 (DUNLAP PAUL VERNON [US]); | [A]US6057288 (PEARSON JAMES P [US], et al); | [PAPX]WO0032152 (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al); |