EP1289844 - CAN TOP FOR DRINKS CANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knoth, Hans-Jürgen Am Brunkelt 147 98631 Behrungen / DE | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Engel, Christoph Klaus PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel & Weihrauch, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01934011.6 | 23.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001EP05947 | Priority number, date | DE2000125737 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10025737 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189945 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289844 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289844 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/48 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B65D25/48 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOSENAUFSATZ FÜR GETRÄNKEDOSEN | [2003/11] | English: | CAN TOP FOR DRINKS CANS | [2003/11] | French: | PIECE CYLINDRIQUE RAPPORTEE POUR BOITES-BOISSON | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | GB | 13.10.2004 | IE | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | TR | 13.10.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | SE | 13.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | AT | 23.05.2005 | CY | 23.05.2005 | LU | 23.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
IT | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
CY | 23.05.2005 | ||
LU | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
CY | 23.05.2005 | ||
LU | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
CY | 23.05.2005 | ||
LU | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
CY | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 23.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2075721 (HOMMEL WILLIAM B) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3185341 (BARBOUR RICHARD T) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 22; figures 7-10 *; | [A]NL8302980 (FRANCISCUS ANTONIUS OUDT) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5071042 (ESPOSITO JEFF F [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5117980 (IONIDES CHRISTOS G [GB]) [A] 10* column 2, line 52 - line 53; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | GB865259 | US5732851 | DE29915265U |