EP1312050 - PARKING FEE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Payway Oy Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARJU, Heikki Mariankatu 20 A 34 FIN-48100 Kotka / FI | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01934048.8 | 14.05.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001FI00464 | Priority number, date | FI20000001159 | 15.05.2000 Original published format: FI 20001159 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0188856 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312050 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312050 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07C1/30, G07B15/02, G07F7/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G07F17/0014 (EP);
G06Q20/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/127 (EP);
G06Q20/16 (EP);
G06Q20/3224 (EP);
G07B15/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARKGEBÜHRSYSTEM | [2003/21] | English: | PARKING FEE SYSTEM | [2003/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE TARIFS DE STATIONNEMENT | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 27.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 05.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | IE | 14.05.2008 | LU | 14.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9320539 (JONSSON TOMMY [SE]); | [X]WO9719568 (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]); | [X]WO9745814 (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]); | [X]WO9910844 (RISING ROLF [SE]); | [X]DE19749578 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0952557 (LEVY NESSIM IGAL [IL]); | [X]EP0971320 (BARAN ADVANCED TECH LTD [IL]); | [X]WO0025271 (CASS LESLIE JOHN [ZA]) |