EP1284770 - ASPIRATING DENTAL SYRINGE WITH NEEDLE SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFETY SYRINGES, INC. Suite 204, 1925 Palomar Oaks Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Safety Syringes, Inc. Suite 204, 1925 Palomar Oaks Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRENFELL, William, W. 467 Hillbrook Drive Baldwin, MO 63011 / US | 02 /
KLAWITTER, Ronald, R. 3344 Horstman Road Berger, MO 63014 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01935015.6 | 02.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US14252 | Priority number, date | US20000569692 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: US 569692 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185237 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284770 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50, A61M5/32 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/3271 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3112 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3139 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31508 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
A61M2205/588 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/28 (EP,US);
A61M5/31505 (EP,US);
A61M5/31511 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | DENTALE SPRITZE MIT NADELABSCHIRMUNG | [2003/09] | English: | ASPIRATING DENTAL SYRINGE WITH NEEDLE SHIELD | [2003/09] | French: | SERINGUE D'ASPIRATION DENTAIRE POURVUE D'UNE PROTECTION D'AIGUILLE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 07.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4915702 (HABER TERRY [US]) [A] 1,16,24 * column 8, line 4 - line 35 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5263942 (SMEDLEY WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1,16,24 * column 4, line 15 - line 37 * * figures 3,4,7,8 *; | [AD]EP0864335 (SAFETY SYRINGES INC [US]) [AD] 1,16,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US6004296 (JANSEN HUBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1,16,24 * column 8, line 14 - line 34 ** figures 5-8 * | by applicant | US3583399 | US4333457 | US4333456 | US4381779 |