EP1284601 - ALLANTOIN-CONTAINING SKIN CREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alwyn Company, Inc. Highway 60 East Lake Crystal, MN 56055 / US | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARBER, Elliott 1720 Orchid Drive North North Mankato, MN 56003 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01935174.1 | 09.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US14899 | Priority number, date | US20000570120 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: US 570120 | US20010758781 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: US 758781 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0187232 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284601 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/50, A61K31/415, A61K7/48 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/4946 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/09] | A01N43/50, A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUTSCHUTZCREME ENTHALTEND ALLANTOIN | [2003/09] | English: | ALLANTOIN-CONTAINING SKIN CREAM | [2003/09] | French: | CREME POUR LA PEAU CONTENANT DE L'ALLANTOINE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/09] | Divisional application(s) | EP07021279.0 / EP2172106 | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 11.02.2008 | Date of receipt | 17.07.2009 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1202635 (LUZIER INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 1, line 11 - line 39 * * page 1, line 83 - line 88 * * page 2, line 60 - line 107 * * example 1; claim - *; | [X]FR2405068 (SAUBA LAB [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 28 - line 34 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 15 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0487404 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [A] 1-24 * page 2, line 27 - line 31 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 56 *; | [A]US5536502 (MULDER GERIT D [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 33 ** table 1 *; | [X]WO9802138 (COSMETICOS NATURAL IND COM [BR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 31 - line 34 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 19 * * page 3, line 31 - line 40 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1004289 (PUGLIESE PETER T [US], et al) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0025] , [0027]; example VIII; claim - * | International search | [X]JPS58140013 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); | [X]US4880621 (GROLLIER JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | [Y]US5827870 (CHODOSH DANIEL FRANK [US]); | [YP]US6080393 (LIU JUE-CHEN [US], et al); | [A]US5863548 (ELDER TODD [US]); | [Y]US4707354 (GARLEN DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US4806262 (SNYDER WILLIAM E [US]); | [Y]US5830483 (SEIDEL KURT [DE], et al) |