EP1257557 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING N-(PHOSPHONOMETHYL)GLYCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology LLC 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [2003/03] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Degussa AG Standort Trostberg, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HITZLER, Martin Austrasse 71 83342 Tacherting / DE | 02 /
THALHAMMER, Franz Kolpingstrasse 13 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
HAMMER, Benedikt Am Anger 24 83342 Tacherting / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2002/47] | Bosch, Henry A. Monsanto Services International S.A., Patent Department, Avenue de Tervuren 270/272, Letter Box No. 1 1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 01936052.8 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP01749 | Priority number, date | DE20001007702 | 19.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007702 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160830 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257557 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257557 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07F9/3813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-(PHOSPHONOMETHYL)GLYCIN | [2002/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING N-(PHOSPHONOMETHYL)GLYCINE | [2002/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE N-(PHOSPHONOMETHYL)GLYCINE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 21.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2003 | FI | 10.09.2003 | IE | 10.09.2003 | NL | 10.09.2003 | TR | 10.09.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | ES | 21.12.2003 | PT | 22.12.2003 | AT | 16.02.2004 | LU | 16.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
TR | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
AT | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
AT | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
IE | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0323821 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [DY] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9705149 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5948938 (NAKANO KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [E]DE19938622 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [E] 1-17* claims 1,20 *; | [Y] - "RECYCLE PROCESS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE,GB, (199712), no. 40466, ISSN 0374-4353, page 942, XP000735768 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * |