EP1287006 - ANTITUMORAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMA MAR, S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Poligono Industrial de Tres Cantos 28760 Tres Cantos Madrid / ES | [2007/43] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states PHARMA MAR, S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Poligono Industrial de Tres Cantos 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACEÑA, José Luis, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 02 /
ADRIO, Javier, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 03 /
CUEVAS, Carmen, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 04 /
GALLEGO, Pilar, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 05 /
MANZANARES, Ignacio, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 06 /
MUNT, Simon, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | 07 /
RODRIGUEZ, Ignacio, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | [2007/35] |
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
ACENA, José Luis, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
ADRIO, Javier, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
CUEVAS, Carmen, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | |||
04 /
GALLEGO, Pilar, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | |||
05 /
MANZANARES, Ignacio, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | |||
06 /
MUNT, Simon, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Calera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | |||
07 /
RODRIGUEZ, Ignacio, Pharma Mar S.A. Calle de la Caera 3, Pol. Ind. de Tres Cantos Tres Cantos, E-28760 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2003/10] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01936649.1 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001GB02487 | Priority number, date | GB20000013783 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0013783 | GB20010002472 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: GB 0102472 | GB20010004732 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: GB 0104732 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0194357 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287006 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287006 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/22, C07F9/28, C07D263/20, A61K31/045, A61K31/13, A61K31/16, A61K31/42, A61K31/66 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C07D263/24 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C211/15 (EP,US);
C07C215/08 (EP,US);
C07C215/52 (EP,US);
C07C217/08 (EP,US);
C07C219/06 (EP,US);
C07C225/06 (EP,US);
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C233/22 (EP,US);
C07C237/08 (EP,US);
C07C251/38 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C275/10 (EP,US);
C07C275/28 (EP,US);
C07C311/04 (EP,US);
C07C335/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | 21.11.2002 | LT | 21.11.2002 | LV | 21.11.2002 | MK | 21.11.2002 | RO | 21.11.2002 | SI | 21.11.2002 | Title | German: | ANTITUMORALE VERBINDUNGEN | [2003/10] | English: | ANTITUMORAL COMPOUNDS | [2003/10] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES ANTITUMORAUX | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2007 | CY | 24.10.2007 | DK | 24.10.2007 | FI | 24.10.2007 | NL | 24.10.2007 | TR | 24.10.2007 | SE | 24.01.2008 | GR | 25.01.2008 | PT | 24.03.2008 | LU | 06.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
LU | 06.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 24.10.2007 | |
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 24.10.2007 | |
SE | 24.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2346771 (FRANK LODGE, et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * page 1, column 1, line 54 *; | [X]US2363082 (RINGK WILLIAM F) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * page 3, column 1, line 30 - page 6, column 1, line 20 *; | [X]US2399118 (HOMEYER AUGUST H) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * example 5 *; | [X]US2424311 (HARRIS STANTON A) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,15 * claim 12 *; | [X]DE828547 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * example 1 *; | [X]GB1057652 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1,5,8-11,15 * example 1 *; | [X]GB1433920 (ICI LTD) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * page 4, column 1, line 21 - line 22 *; | [DX]WO9952521 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [DX] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [T] - GARRIDO L ET AL, "Obscuraminols, new unsaturated amino alcohols from the tunicate Pseudodistoma obscurum: structure and absolute configuration", TETRAHEDRON, (20010521), vol. 57, no. 21, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 4579 - 4588, XP004240727 [T] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)00372-6 | [X] - CUADROS R ET AL, "THE MARINE COMPOUND SPISULOSINE AN INHIBITOR OF CELL PROLIFERATION,PROMOTES THE DISASSEMBLY OF ACTIN STRESS FIBERS", CANCER LETTERS, (2000), vol. 152, no. 2, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 23 - 29, XP001025938 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(99)00428-0 | [X] - LEONARDI, A, "Cytolytic and cytostatic activity of synthetic necrosamine (4,5-diaminoeicosane) on two strains of human tumor cells cultivated in vitro", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19610109), XP002179016 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15,16,18-20 * abstract * | [ ] - GIORN. ITAL. CHEMIOTERAP. (1958), 5, 291-5 | [X] - IKAWA, "Studies on a Lipopolysaccharide from Escherichai Coli", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1966), vol. 133, no. 2, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 476 - 485, XP001018540 [X] 1-16,18-20 * see whole document, especially tables 5 & 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1966.tb52384.x | [X] - JARES-ERIJMAN E A ET AL, "CRUCIGASTERINS, NEW POLYUNSATURATED AMINO ALCOHOLS FROM THE MEDITERRANEAN TUNICATE PSEUDODISTOMA CRUCIGASTER", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 58, no. 21, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5732 - 5737, XP001021691 [X] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00073a036 | [XA] - PROSTENIK M ET AL, "UEBER EINE EINFACHE SYNTHESE VON ALIPHATISCHEN ALPHA-DIAMINEN", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, (1966), vol. 97, no. 2, ISSN 0026-9247, pages 340 - 347, XP001018555 [X] 4,5,7-12,15 * Compounds 1,2,4,5,6a,6b,7a,7b,11-14; first paragraph * [A] 18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00905250 | [X] - KOK J W ET AL, "DIHYDROCERMIDE BIOLOGY STRUCTURE-SPECIFIC METABOLISM AND INTRACELLULAR LOCALIZATION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970822), vol. 272, no. 34, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2428 - 2436, XP001019054 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.34.21128 | [X] - POCH ET AL, "Relative Stereochemistry of Funomisin B1 at C-2 and C-3", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1994), vol. 35, no. 42, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7707 - 7710, XP001018512 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(94)80098-7 | [X] - JIMENEZ C ET AL, "NOVEL MARINE SPONGE AMINO ACIDS, 10. XESTOAMINOLS FROM XESTOSPONGIA SP", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (199007), vol. 53, no. 4, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 978 - 982, XP001025933 [X] 1-17 * page 979 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50070a033 | [X] - SALAKO Q ET AL, "99mTC-Labelling Studies of Solubilized Ligands - Part 1", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION APPLICATIONS AND INSTRUMENTATION PART A: APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, (1989), vol. 40, no. 7, pages 621 - 624, XP000038821 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0883-2889(89)90118-4 | [X] - TUREL R J ET AL, "SPHINGOLIPIDS: PART II-SYNTHESIS OF 1,3-DIHYDROXY-2-AMINOTETRADECANE", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (197909), vol. 18B, pages 219 - 221, XP001025832 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15,16 * Compounds (II)(a)-(e), (III)-(V) * | [X] - PROSTENIK M ET AL, "Necrosaminreihe, 6. Mitteilung: Über eine einfache Synthese von racemischem Necrosamin", BULLETIN SCIENTIFIQUE, CONSEIL DES ACADEMIES DES SCIENCES ET DES ARTS DE LA RSF DE YOUGOSLAVIE, SECTION A : SCIENCES NATURELLES, TECHNIQUES ET MÉDICALES, (1972), vol. 17, no. 5-6, ISSN 0350-1558, pages 145 - 146, XP001025912 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15,16 * Compounds 3-5 * | [X] - GERENCEVIK M ET AL, "N-Acyl Amino Acids in the Dakin-West Reaction: Replacements of the Acyl Groups", BULLETIN SCIENTIFIQUE, CONSEIL DES ACADEMIES DES SCIENCES ET DES ARTS DE LA RSF DE YOUGOSLAVIE, SECTION A : SCIENCES NATURELLES, TECHNIQUES ET MÉDICALES, (1970), vol. 15, no. 5-6, ISSN 0350-1558, page 158, XP001025913 [X] 1,4,5,7,8,10-12,15 * the whole document * | [X] - RAO K V ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CONSTITUTION OF PEDICELLIC ACID A NEW DICARBOXYLIC ACID FROM THE LEAVES OF DIDYMOCARPUS PEDICELLATA", TETRAHEDRON, (1966), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 1495 - 1498, XP001018545 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15 * Page 1497, the diamine * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)99448-7 | [X] - PALAMETA B ET AL, "CHROMATOGRAPHY OF THE LIPIDE BASED ON PAPER IMPREGNATED WITH SILICIC ACID", CROATICA CHEMICA ACTA, (1961), vol. 33, ISSN 0011-1643, pages 133 - 135, XP001018549 [X] 1-16 * table 1 * | [X] - "SYNTHETISCHE VERSUCHE IN DER NECROSAMIN-REIHE", NATURWISSENSCHAFTEN, (1956), vol. 43, pages 349 - 350, XP001025955 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15 * Compounds Ia and Ib * | [DX] - PROSTENIK M ET AL, "APPLICATION OF THE ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS IN THE DETERMINATION OF THECONFIGURATION OF AMINO ALCOHOLS AND DIAMINES WITH TWO ADJACENT ASYMMETRIC CARBON ATOMS", CROATICA CHEMICA ACTA, (1957), vol. 29, ISSN 0011-1643, pages 393 - 402, XP001018390 [DX] 1,4,5,7-12,15 * the whole document * | [X] - ALAUPOVIK ET AL, "Necrosamine Series II. Synthesis of Racemic 4,5-Diaminoeicosane and of 2-Methyl-3,4-diaminononadecane", CROATICA CHEMICA ACTA, (1956), vol. 28, ISSN 0011-1643, pages 211 - 218, XP001018517 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,15,16 * Compounds I, II, VIIa, VIIIa, IXa & Xa * | [X] - MORI ET AL, "Synthesis and absolute configuration of the two epimeric aliphatic amino alcohols [(5E,7E)-2-amino-5,7-tetradecadien-3-ols] isolated from a sponge, Xestospongia sp.", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (1992), no. 2, ISSN 0170-2041, pages 131 - 137, XP001025984 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - KOEHL W, "UEBER DIE BETA,BETA-DIAMINOADIPINSAEURE UND EINE NEUE METHODE ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON GAMMA-AMINOSAEUREN", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1903), vol. 36, ISSN 0365-9496, pages 172 - 174, XP001018508 [X] 1,5,8-11,15 * Title * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19030360137 | [X] - JAENECKE E, "UEBER AMIDODIAETHYLKETON UND AMIDODIAETHYLCARBINOL", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1899), no. 32, ISSN 0365-9496, pages 1095 - 1103, XP001018509 [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * Bottom of page 1099 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.189903201178 | [X] - STRAUSS E, "UEBER AMINOPROPANOL-(2.1) UND AMINOBUTANOL-(2.3)", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1900), vol. 33, ISSN 0365-9496, pages 2825 - 2830, XP001018510 [X] 1,4,5,8-11,15 * Page 2827, line 1 & page 2828, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19000330308 | [X] - CLAUS A, "ZUR KENNTNISS DER BIRBROMBERNSTEINSAEURE AUS DER DIAMIDOBERNSTEINSAEURE", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1882), vol. 15, ISSN 0009-2940, pages 1844 - 1851, XP001018524 [X] 1,5,8-11,15 * the whole document * |