EP1294990 - IMPROVED DISPENSERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gent, Keith Andrew Edgefield Hall Farm, Edgefield, Melton Constable Norfolk NR24 2RS / GB | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Dunnett, Julie Elizabeth Barker Brettell LLP St. John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Dunnett, Julie Elizabeth Barker Brettell, St John's Innovation Centre, Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01936690.5 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001GB02578 | Priority number, date | GB20000014767 | 17.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0014767 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198590 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1294990 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1294990 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/03 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A01G13/0287 (EP,US);
B65H16/005 (EP,US);
B65H16/06 (EP,US);
E01C23/03 (EP,US);
E02D31/004 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41346 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER SPENDER | [2003/13] | English: | IMPROVED DISPENSERS | [2003/13] | French: | DISTRIBUTEURS AMELIORES | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2005 | BE | 05.01.2005 | CH | 05.01.2005 | FI | 05.01.2005 | FR | 05.01.2005 | IT | 05.01.2005 | LI | 05.01.2005 | NL | 05.01.2005 | TR | 05.01.2005 | DK | 05.04.2005 | GR | 05.04.2005 | SE | 05.04.2005 | DE | 06.04.2005 | ES | 16.04.2005 | PT | 05.06.2005 | CY | 12.06.2005 | LU | 12.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
IT | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 12.06.2005 | ||
LU | 12.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 12.06.2005 | ||
LU | 12.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 12.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
FR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
DE | 06.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 05.01.2005 | |
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 05.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2278245 (LAROCHE PIERRE [FR]) [A] 6 * page 3, line 3 - line 5; figure 3 *; | [A]US4705229 (BARAZONE MOUNQUE [US]) [A] 1* column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 13; figures 1,2A,2B *; | [Y]US4793731 (GNESA EDWARD C [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-12 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 14 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 16; figures 1-7 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 3 *; | [DY]GB2337039 (GENT KEITH ANDREW [GB]) [DY] 1-4,6-12 * page 16, paragraph L; figures 1-6; claims 1-4,10-14 * | by applicant | GB2337039 |