EP1284775 - MEDICAL DEVICE WITH IMPROVED WIRE GUIDE ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilson-Cook Medical Inc. 4900 Bethania Station Road, P.O. BOX 4191 Winston-Salem North Carolina 27105-4191 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states WILSON-COOK MEDICAL INC. 4900 Bethania Station Road, P.O. BOX 4191 Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27105-4191 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Douglas, A. 1 Lydon Lane Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 / US | 02 /
CARTER, Matthew, P. 146 Edinburg Way Dobson, NC 27017 / US | 03 /
GIBBONS, William, S. 2228 Westover Drive Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US | 04 /
FOUSHEE, Jason, D. 136 Woodbriar Road Winston-Salem, NC 27106 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2003/09] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01937282.0 | 09.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US15101 | Priority number, date | US20000205192P | 18.05.2000 Original published format: US 205192 P | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0187399 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284775 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284775 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61B18/14 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22038 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00553 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1407 (EP,US);
A61B2018/144 (EP,US);
A61B2218/002 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0037 (EP,US);
A61M2025/004 (EP,US);
A61M25/0028 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M39/0613 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES GERÄT MIT VERBERSSERTEM FÜHRUNGSDRAHTZUGÄNG | [2003/09] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH IMPROVED WIRE GUIDE ACCESS | [2003/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL DOTE D'UN MEILLEUR ACCES AU GUIDE FIL | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2647005 (GUERBET SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,11,12,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US4838269 (ROBINSON DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,11,13 * column 2, line 64 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9744082 (PERCUSURGE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 4, lines 3-25; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US6017340 (CASSIDY TODD [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11,14 * column 6, lines 35-67; figure 8 *; | [A]US5766191 (TREROTOLA SCOTT O [US]) [A] 7,12 * column A; figure 11C *; | [A]US5800444 (RIDINGER MARK T [US], et al) [A] 7,12 * column A; figure 1 * |