EP1292739 - FIRE-RESISTANT BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATION 800 Presque Isle Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUDSON, Colin, J. Ranworth 87 London Road Worcester WR5 2DZ / GB | 02 /
RAE, Michael, Scott Orchard House 23 North Terrace Mildenhall IP28 7AA / GB | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01937815.7 | 21.05.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US40778 | Priority number, date | US20000575020 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: US 575020 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0188300 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292739 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/42, E04B1/94 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
E04B1/941 (EP,US);
E04C1/42 (EP,US);
E04B2001/949 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | E04C1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERBESTÄNDIGER BLOCK | [2003/12] | English: | FIRE-RESISTANT BLOCK | [2003/12] | French: | BLOC RESISTANT AU FEU | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 20.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1585125 (BFG GLASSGROUP) [X] 1,3,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 4,6; | [X]US5928724 (DESCAMPS PIERRE [BE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5928724 (DESCAMPS PIERRE [BE], et al); | [A]US5595032 (RICHARDS JEFFREY [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5595032 |