EP1192057 - ARTICULATED ROD ELEMENT FOR AN ADJUSTABLE VEHICLE ROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Fahrzeug-Dachsysteme GmbH Am Radeland 125 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSELGRUBER, Andreas Am Sonnenberg 41 71735 Eberdingen-Nussdorf / DE | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gottfried, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Müller, Gottfried, et al Wittner & Müller Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01938164.9 | 04.05.2001 | [2002/14] | WO2001EP05065 | Priority number, date | DE2000123047 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023047 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185478 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192057 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B60J7/1234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | GESTÄNGETEIL FÜR EIN VERSTELLBARES FAHRZEUGDACH | [2002/14] | English: | ARTICULATED ROD ELEMENT FOR AN ADJUSTABLE VEHICLE ROOF | [2002/14] | French: | PIECE DE TRINGLERIE POUR TOIT DE VEHICULE A POSITION REGLABLE | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 18.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB332120 (WILLIAM HENRY BISHOP) [A] 1 * page 2, line 38 - line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US2768857 (ALBRECHT LEONARD N) [DA] 1 * &DE943747C; column 5, line 39 - line 58; figures 11-13 *; | [DA]US5967590 (BEIERL DOMINIK [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * &DE19532568C; column 2, line 44 - line 52; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE943747 | DE19532568 |