EP1308027 - DROPLET DEPOSITION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xaar Technology Limited Science Park Cambridge CB4 OXR / GB | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEMPLE, Stephen The Windmill 10 Cambridge Road Impington, Cambridge CB4 9NU / GB | 02 /
MANNING, Howard, John 4 Brights Crescent Edinburgh EH9 2DB / GB | [2013/12] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
TEMPLE, Stephen The Windmill 10 Cambridge Road Impington Cambridge CB4 9NU / GB | ||
02 /
MANNING, Howard, John 4 Brights Crescent Edinburgh EH9 2DB / GB | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/19] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01938422.1 | 13.06.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001GB02598 | Priority number, date | GB20000019849 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0019849 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215563 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308027 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308027 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B41J2/005 (KR);
G06K15/102 (EP,US);
H04N1/4015 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | TRÖPFCHENAUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT | [2003/19] | English: | DROPLET DEPOSITION APPARATUS | [2003/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉPOT DE GOUTTELETTES | [2013/12] |
Former [2003/19] | DISPOSITIF DE DEPOT DE GOUTTELETTES | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 30.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 30.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 30.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 30.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 16.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9735421 (XAAR LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0963844 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5917510 (NARUSHIMA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0963844 |