EP1291948 - FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION SYSTEM, AND FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION INTERRUPTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Tetsuya 1-15-28, Takamoridai Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0032 / JP | 02 /
TOMIZAWA, Takeshi 12-12, Mayumiminami 1-chome Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0123 / JP | 03 /
UKAI, Kunihiro 2-207-97, Higashiikoma Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0213 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01938610.1 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001JP04960 | Priority number, date | JP20000177938 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177938 | [2003/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197312 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291948 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H01M8/04231 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04228 (EP,KR);
H01M8/04303 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/0668 (EP,US);
H01M8/0675 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ENERGIE UND UNTERBRECHUNGSVERFAHREN | [2003/11] | English: | FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION SYSTEM, AND FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION INTERRUPTING METHOD | [2003/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE POUR LA GENERATION D' ENERGIE ET PROCEDE D'INTERRUPTION | [2006/39] |
Former [2003/11] | SYSTEME DE GENERATION DE PUISSANCE A PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDE D'INTERRUPTION DE LA GENERATION DE PUISSANCE D'UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2002 | Translation filed | 10.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5178969 (AMEMIYA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS6188461 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPS6313277 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH0451469 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]US5648182 (HARA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]JPH11111319 (NISSAN MOTOR) |