EP1298773 - PERMANENT MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hiroshi 1-5-B20-209, Takanodai Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0861 / JP | 02 /
NISHIYAMA, Noriyoshi 15-27, Sugahara-cho Izumiotsu-shi, Osaka 595-0066 / JP | 03 /
KISHIBE, Taro 2-33-1-2-404, Higashiyamadai Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 669-1133 / JP | 04 /
KADO, Haruhiko 4-309, Cosmo Moriyama, 300-25, Fuke-cho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0033 / JP | 05 /
TAMAMURA, Toshiyuki 5-7-10, Sakuragaoka Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0057 / JP | 06 /
KATAOKA, Hisakazu 33-27, Tsukamachi Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0092 / JP | 07 /
SHINTO, Masayuki 20-1, Imajuku-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0861 / JP | 08 /
MORINO, Osaaki 39-5-9, Nagao-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0002 / JP | [2003/22] |
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hiroshi 1-5-B20-209, Takanodai Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0861 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIYAMA, Noriyoshi 15-27, Sugahara-cho Izumiotsu-shi, Osaka 595-0066 / JP | |||
03 /
KISHIBE, Taro 2-33-1-2-404, Higashiyamadai Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 669-1133 / JP | |||
04 /
KADO, Naruhiko 4-309, Cosmo Moriyama, 300-25, Fuke-cho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0033 / JP | |||
05 /
TAMAMURA, Toshiyuki 5-7-10, Sakuragaoka Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0057 / JP | |||
06 /
KATAOKA, Hisakazu 33-27, Tsukamachi Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0092 / JP | |||
07 /
SHINTO, Masayuki 20-1, Imajuku-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0861 / JP | |||
08 /
MORINO, Osaaki 39-5-9, Nagao-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0002 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01938675.4 | 14.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001JP05084 | Priority number, date | JP20000177951 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177951 | [2003/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197363 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298773 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H02K1/276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | PERMANENTMAGNET-SYNCHRONMOTOR | [2008/22] | English: | PERMANENT MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR | [2003/14] | French: | MOTEUR SYNCHRONE A AIMANT PERMANENT | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/14] | PERMANENTMAGNET-SYSCHRONMOTOR | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2002 | Translation filed | 16.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05304737 ; | [Y]JPS63140645 ; | [X]EP0809343 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,10 * column 2, line 8 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0823771 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8-14 * column 2, line 26 - line 28; figure 1 * * column 4, line 52 - column 8, line 38 *; | [XY]WO9913556 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11 * figures 5,9c *[Y] 7; | [Y]US5936323 (SHIBUKAWA SUETARO [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 25 - line 44; figures 2,5A,6 *; | [PX]EP1014541 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,5,6,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0028] - paragraph [0038]; figures 5,9c * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940222), vol. 018, no. 109, Database accession no. (E - 1513), & JP05304737 A 19931116 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11 * abstract * [Y] 7 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881021), vol. 012, no. 397, Database accession no. (E - 672), & JP63140645 A 19880613 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract * | International search | [X]EP0352573 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]WO9913556 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2000134836 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2000116172 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) | Examination | US5684352 |