Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
15.01.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.07.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.01.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
31.01.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
29.01.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2002 | Change - extension states | |
22.11.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.05.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.07.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |