EP1284856 - ARMOR-PLATING COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Twaron GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHR, Michael Moospfad 12B 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
GEITZ, Carsten Im Ostersiepen 36 42119 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
WINTERSIEG, Jörg Norkshäuschen 145 42109 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Fett, Günter, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 01940408.6 | 05.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001EP05114 | Priority number, date | DE2000123181 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023181 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185443 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284856 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284856 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/00, F41H5/04, B32B3/10 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
F41H5/0428 (EP,US);
B32B7/00 (KR);
B32B3/10 (EP,US);
F41H5/0492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 11.12.2002 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PANZERUNGSVERBUNDMATERIAL | [2003/09] | English: | ARMOR-PLATING COMPOSITE | [2003/09] | French: | COMPOSITE POUR LE BLINDAGE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.11.2003 | TR | 26.11.2003 | PT | 26.04.2004 | LU | 05.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 26.11.2003 | |
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
LU | 05.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | TR | 26.11.2003 | |
LU | 05.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | LU | 05.05.2004 | |
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | MC | 31.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2723214 (MEYER EARL A) [X] 1,7,9,10,15,16 * column 1, lines 15-18 * * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 5 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4241457 (KLEIN JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,7-11,13-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4114809 (KELLNER GERD DR ING [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,9,13,14 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0678724 (DUNN ERIC [US]) [A] 12 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 14 ** figures 1,3 * |