EP1311704 - NOVEL TARGET GENES FOR DISEASES OF THE HEART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediGene AG Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Medigene AG Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNK, Daniela Hofmark 8 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | 02 /
REUNER, Birgit Heiterwangerstrasse 10 81373 Munich / DE | 03 /
BECK, Joachim Herterichstrasse 115 81477 Munich / DE | 04 /
HENKEL, Thomas Freienfelsstrasse 20a 81249 Munich / DE | 05 /
STOSS, Oliver Brunellenweg 29 D-80689 München / DE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | Leidescher, Thomas, Dr., et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01940545.5 | 30.05.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP06165 | Priority number, date | US20000207400P | 30.05.2000 Original published format: US 207400 P | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0192567 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311704 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A01K67/027, A61K49/00, C07K16/18, G01N33/53 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0375 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ZIELGENE FÜR HERZERKRANKUNGEN | [2003/21] | English: | NOVEL TARGET GENES FOR DISEASES OF THE HEART | [2003/21] | French: | NOUVEAU GENES CIBLES POUR LES MALADIES DU COEUR | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 01.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9101498 (VIOCLONE BIOLOG INC [CA]) [Y] 40,41,47 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9813476 (LEINWAND LESLIE A [US], et al); | [Y]DE19725186 (MEDIGENE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-41,47 * page 7, line 55 - page 8; claims 6-15 *; | [A]WO9919471 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al); | [Y]WO9924571 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-41,47 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9949062 (GENE LOGIC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-41,47 * claims 17-22 *; | [Y]WO9950410 (VICTOR CHANG CARDIAC RESEARCH [AU], et al) [Y] 1-41,47 * the whole document *; | [X] - WALKER M ET AL, "Cardiomyopathy-associated genes identified by genome-scale expression analysis", EMBL, EBI, (20000503), Database accession no. AW755252, XP002203686 [X] 1-41,47 * abstract * | [X] - AIHARA Y ET AL, "CARDIAC ANKYRIN REPEAT PROTEIN CARP IN A NOVEL MARKER OF MYOCARDIAL STRESS: REGULATION OF TRANSCRIPTION THROUGH M-CAT ELEMENT BY STRESS-RESPONSIVE MAP KINASE PATHWAYS", CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS, TX, US, (19991102), vol. 110, no. 18, SUPPL, ISSN 0009-7322, pages I - 627-I-628, XP001056080 [X] 1-41,47 | [Y] - LOWES B D ET AL, "CHANGES IN GENE EXPRESSION IN THE INTACT HUMAN HEART. DOWNREGULATION OF ALPHA-MYOSIN HEAVY CHAIN IN HYPERTROPHIED, FAILING VENTRICULAR MYOCARDIUM", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971101), vol. 100, no. 9, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 2315 - 2321, XP002910970 [Y] 1-41,47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119770 | [Y] - KELLER ET AL, "Differential expression of alpha- and beta-enolase genes during rat heart development and hypertrophy", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: HEART AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, THE AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, XX, (19951201), vol. 38, no. 6, ISSN 0363-6135, pages H1843 - H1851, XP002096499 [Y] 1-41,47 * the whole document * | [Y] - BOHELER ET AL, "Gene expression in cardiac hypertrophy", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920901), vol. 2, no. 5, ISSN 1050-1738, pages 176 - 182, XP002096139 [Y] 1-41,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1050-1738(92)90046-U |