Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6840409 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2005 | B2 | US2004099692 | 27.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | FR0101658 | 29.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004501034 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | FR0101658 | 29.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7414201 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | FR0101658 | 29.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1284905 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2006 | B1 | EP1284905 | 26.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | FR0101658 | 29.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60121938T | 26.07.2007 | T2 | DE60121938D1 | 14.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | FR0101658 | 29.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0192120 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE334888T | 15.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2809379 | 29.11.2002 | B1 | FR2809379 | 30.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0006834 | 29.05.2000 |