EP1284905 - PACKAGING FOR FLUID PRODUCT WITH HINGE CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint-Rémy-sur-Durolle / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint Rémy sur Durolle / FR | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint Remy sur Durolle / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMBRICOURT, Géry La Verchère F-63300 Escoutoux / FR | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Somnier, Jean-Louis Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Somnier, Jean-Louis Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01940622.2 | 29.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001FR01658 | Priority number, date | FR20000006834 | 29.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006834 | [2003/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0192120 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284905 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284905 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/32, B65D47/08 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
B65D1/32 (EP,US);
B65D47/0804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER MIT SCHARNIERVERSCHLUSS | [2003/09] | English: | PACKAGING FOR FLUID PRODUCT WITH HINGE CLOSURE | [2003/09] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT POUR PRODUIT FLUIDE AVEC UNE FERMETURE A CHARNIERE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CY | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SE | 02.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3948422 (MICALLEF LEWIS A) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 30-48; figures 7-9 * [A] ; | [A]FR2655948 (FRANCE ASSESSOIRES AUTOMOBILES [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 24-27; figure 2 * * page 2, lines 28-33; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2773537 (QUALIPAC SA [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | FR1513468 | US3948422 | FR2655948 |